Global Patent Index - EP 1083266 A2

EP 1083266 A2 2001-03-14 - Fitting for personal hygiene, in particular for bathrooms

Title (en)

Fitting for personal hygiene, in particular for bathrooms

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Körperhygiene, insbesondere für Badezimmer

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'hygiène personnelle, en particulier pour salle de bains

Publication

EP 1083266 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119539 A

Priority

IT BO990481 A

Abstract (en)

The proposed fitting for personal hygiene and lower limbs cleaning, in particular for bathrooms includes a substantially ring-like support structure (5), whose inner part is equipped with a duct (6) opening outside with a plurality of channels (6a) oriented in such a way, as to direct water toward said lower limbs and/or intimate parts. The support structure (5) is hinged to relative supporting means (2), which are fastened to a vertical wall (3a). The support structure (5) moves from a working configuration (B), which allows the personal hygiene and/or lower limbs cleaning, in time relation with the flow of water fed by the channels (6a), to a rest configuration (A), in which the size of the fitting (1) is reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/08; E03C 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01); E03D 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/08 (2013.01); E03C 1/0408 (2013.01); B05B 1/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083266 A2 20010314; EP 1083266 A3 20011212; IT 1310440 B1 20020213; IT BO990481 A1 20010308; IT BO990481 D0 19990908

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI