Global Patent Index - EP 1083268 A2

EP 1083268 A2 2001-03-14 - Glass facade with fixing device

Title (en)

Glass facade with fixing device

Title (de)

Glas-Fassadenbekleidungen mit einer Befestigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Façade vitrée avec dispositif de fixation

Publication

EP 1083268 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115265 A

Priority

DE 19943525 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a fixing device for an insulating glass pane (1) with spaced holders (3) arranged on a support construction (2). The holders have support plates (5a), on which adjacent glass panes and their intermediate joints are fitted with a clamping plate (5b), screws (8,9) and a joint seal. The glass panes are arranged vertically or inclined to the vertical as a facade. The holder supports a welded shield (4), which is welded to a horizontal strut that engages the horizontal joint of the joint seal, so that it takes the vertical forces of the glass pane. A support plate (5a) is formed above and below the strut, which is screwed to the clamping plate and is welded to a tube connector (12), which is welded to the holder at the support construction.

Abstract (de)

Isolierglasscheibenanordnung mit einer Befestigungsvorrichtung für Isolierglasscheiben (1) o. dgl., mit einer an einem Baukörper festlegbaren Tragkonstruktion (2) und daran angeordneten, die Isolierglasscheiben beabstandet tragenden Halter (3), die Anlageteller (5a) tragen, an denen jeweils benachbarte Isolierglasscheiben und deren dazwischen liegende Fuge anliegen und an denen diese mit einem Spannteller (5b) mittels einer Verschraubung (8, 9), die durch beidseitige Dichtscheiben (7a, 7b) und eine Fugendichtung (11) führt, verspannt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/88; E04F 13/14; E06B 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/88 (2006.01); E06B 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5445 (2013.01); E04B 2/885 (2013.01); E06B 3/5436 (2013.01); E06B 3/5481 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3843619 A1 19900628 - AMANCO L & F AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083268 A2 20010314; EP 1083268 A3 20020130; DE 19943525 A1 20010412; DE 19943525 C2 20030424

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI