Global Patent Index - EP 1083281 A2

EP 1083281 A2 2001-03-14 - Locking device on a door, window or similar

Title (en)

Locking device on a door, window or similar

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung an einer Tür, einem Fenster oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour porte, fenêtre ou similaires

Publication

EP 1083281 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118035 A

Priority

DE 19943046 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a motorised drive with one switch state, in which the drive motor (4) interacts with a locking element (29) but not with an energy storage device (22) for returning the locking element to its release position to drive the locking element into the locking position but not load the storage device, and another in which the motor interacts with the energy storage device but not with the locking device to load the storage device but not move the locking element into the locking position.

Abstract (de)

Eine Verriegelungsvorrichtung an einer Tür, einem Fenster od. dgl. umfaßt wenigstens ein Schloß mit zumindest einem zwischen einer Schließ- und einer Offenstellung hin und her bewegbaren Riegel (29) sowie ein Riegelwiderlager, welches der Riegel (29) in Schließstellung hintergreift. Mittels wenigstens eines gesteuert umschaltbaren motorischen Antriebs mit zumindest einem Antriebsmotor (4) ist der Riegel (29) in die Schließstellung bewegbar und außerdem ein Energiespeicher (20) aufladbar, wobei durch freigesetzte Energie des Energiespeichers (20) das Bewegen des Riegels (29) in die Offenstellung zumindest unterstützt wird. Damit Antriebsmotoren mit verhältnismäßig geringer Leistung und dementsprechend relativ geringem Bauvolumen verwendet werden können, ist vorgesehen, daß bei einem Schaltzustand des motorischen Antriebs der Antriebsmotor (4) mit dem Riegel (29), nicht aber mit dem Energiespeicher (20) in Wirkverbindung steht und der Riegel (29) in die Schließstellung bewegbar, nicht aber der Energiespeicher (20) aufladbar ist und daß bei einem anderen Schaltzustand des motorischen Antriebs der Antriebsmotor (4) mit dem Energiespeicher (20), nicht aber mit dem Riegel (29) in Wirkverbindung steht und der Energiespeicher (20) aufladbar, nicht aber der Riegel (29) in die Schließstellung bewegbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 57/00; E05B 15/04; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0607 (2013.01); E05B 47/0002 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05C 9/1875 (2013.01); E05B 15/04 (2013.01); E05B 47/0006 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0023 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0031 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0067 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29805821 U1 19980604 - PAZEN HELMUT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083281 A2 20010314; EP 1083281 A3 20030319; EP 1083281 B1 20040630; AT 270371 T 20040715; DE 19943046 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140823

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006937

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 270371 T

- Effective date: 20140823

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006937

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130826

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AG

- Free text: ROTO FRANK AG#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROTO FRANK AG#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE)

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006937 P 20040805

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 57/00 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 15/04 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/00 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/18 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/08 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI