Global Patent Index - EP 1083287 A2

EP 1083287 A2 2001-03-14 - Manually resettable device for emergency release of automatic door moving mechanism

Title (en)

Manually resettable device for emergency release of automatic door moving mechanism

Title (de)

Manuell rückstellbare Vorrichtung für Notlösung von Bewegungsmechanismus von automatischen Türen

Title (fr)

Dispositif à réenclenchement manuel pour déclenchement d'urgence de mécanisme d'entraînement de porte automatique

Publication

EP 1083287 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203105 A

Priority

IT MI990548 U

Abstract (en)

A disconnecting device (10) designed to be placed between an automatic door moving mechanism (14) and the door to allow mutual disconnection thereof comprises a first part (11) and a second part (12) designed with one of them to be permanently constrained to the automatic mechanism and the other to the door. Between the former and the latter parts are placed releasable mutual constraint means (15) which are manually resettable by means of resetting means (29) after a disengagement operation for automatic reconnection upon closing of the first and second parts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/668 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/214 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/244 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083287 A2 20010314; EP 1083287 A3 20040121; IT MI990548 U1 20010308; IT MI990548 V0 19990908

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040722

2004-11-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI