Global patent index - EP 1083289 A1

EP 1083289 A1 2001-03-14 - Mechanical connecting device in a system to fix elements on a support structure

Title (en)

Mechanical connecting device in a system to fix elements on a support structure

Title (de)

Mechanische Verbindungsvorrichtung in einem Befestigungssystem von Elementen an einer Tragstuktur

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaision mécanique pour système d'attache d'éléments sur une structure porteuse

Publication

EP 1083289 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402452 A

Priority

FR 9911226 A

Abstract (en)

A fixing device integral with the glass window (9) is provided in each fastening point. A coupling rod (16) perpendicular to the glass surface is mounted on a mounting part (4) fixed to the carrying structure. A flexible flange joint (13) is interposed between the screw (11) and the wall of the hole (10) in order to avoid direct metal-glass contact. The mechanical connection cage (17) is mounted between the rod and the mounting part by a means allowing adjustment during mounting of the position of the rod along its axis. This connection allows, once mounted, a displacement of the rod perpendicular to its axis.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne les systèmes d'attache en au moins un point d'un élément (9) notamment de matériau fragile, comme le verre, sur une structure porteuse, comportant en chaque point d'attache, un dispositif de fixation solidaire de l'élément porté (9) et muni d'une tige d'accrochage (16) sensiblement perpendiculaire à la surface de l'élément (9) et destinée à être montée sur un organe de montage (4) fixé à la structure porteuse. L'invention a pour objet, dans un tel système d'attache, un dispositif de liaison mécanique (17) qui est apte à être monté entre la tige (16) et l'organe (4), qui comporte un moyen permettant le réglage, lors du montage, de la position de la tige (16) selon son axe, et qui est agencé pour autoriser, une fois le dispositif monté, un déplacement de la tige (16) perpendiculairement à son axe, dans des limites fixées, avec possibilité de restriction allant jusqu'à la suppression, lors du montage et/ou une fois le dispositif monté, d'un ou des deux degrés de liberté dudit déplacement, en même temps qu'est assuré, en cas de suppression de ce(s) degré(s) de liberté, un réglage définitif de la position de la tige (16) selon l'axe ou les axes sur lequel ou lesquels le degré de liberté a été supprimé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5436 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19703298 A1 19980806 - ZLATOMIR KRSTIN [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083289 A1 20010314; EP 1083289 B1 20140416; FR 2798953 A1 20010330; FR 2798953 B1 20011026; PT 1083289 E 20140725

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150909

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150903

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140906

2015-06-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2015-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140416

2015-04-30 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 60048515

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150119

2015-03-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20150119

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140416

2015-01-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 60048515

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140416

2014-08-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2014-07-25 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20140715

2014-07-02 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2014-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER AND CIE S.A., CH

2014-05-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 60048515

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140528

2014-05-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2014-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 662704

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140515

2014-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2014-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2014-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-12-25 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: INTG

- Effective date: 20131127

2013-07-31 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: INTG

- Effective date: 20130705

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040115

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI