Global Patent Index - EP 1083293 A1

EP 1083293 A1 2001-03-14 - Drilling tool

Title (en)

Drilling tool

Title (de)

Bohrwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de forage

Publication

EP 1083293 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810739 A

Priority

DE 19942986 A

Abstract (en)

The drilling tool has a shaft (2) with a drill head (4) with at least two cutters (5) of hard metal. The cutters project radially from the edge of the drill head and have dust grooves (7) at least partly between them, which open into at least one spiral conveying groove (3) along the shaft. The bore head has an expanded peripheral contour (8) at least in the area of two of the cutters, which projects radially over the edge (9) of the shaft.

Abstract (de)

Ein Bohrwerkzeug, insbesondere ein Gesteinsbohrer, besitzt einen Schaft (2), dessen eines Ende an ein Einsteckende für die Werkzeugaufnahme eines Bohrgerätes anschliesst und dessen anderes Ende einen Bohrkopf (4) mit wenigstens zwei, aus Hartmetall gebildeten Schneiden (5) aufweist, die den Umfang des Bohrkopfes (4) radial überragen. Wenigstens teilweise verlaufen zwischen den Hartmetallschneiden (5) Kopfmehlnuten (7), die in wenigstens eine, wendelförmig am Schaft (2) umlaufende Abfuhrnut (3) münden. Die Ausbildung des Bohrkopfes (4) ist derart, dass der Bohrkopf (4) wenigstens im Bereich von zwei der Hartmetallschneiden (5) eine erweiterte Umfangskontur (8) aufweist, welche den Umfang (9) des Schaftes (2) radial überragt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 51/00 (2006.01); B28D 1/14 (2006.01); E21B 10/40 (2006.01); E21B 10/44 (2006.01); E21B 10/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/58 (2013.01); E21B 10/40 (2013.01); E21B 10/445 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0669448 A1 19950830 - PLICA WERKZEUGFABRIK AG [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083293 A1 20010314; EP 1083293 B1 20051102; CN 1156641 C 20040707; CN 1287898 A 20010321; DE 19942986 A1 20010315; DE 50011494 D1 20051208; JP 2001121331 A 20010508; US 6405813 B1 20020618; ZA 200004375 B 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150818

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130821

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130821

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120815

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100301

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080803

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051128

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011494

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI