Global Patent Index - EP 1083294 A1

EP 1083294 A1 2001-03-14 - Drilling tool

Title (en)

Drilling tool

Title (de)

Bohrwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de forage

Publication

EP 1083294 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810787 A

Priority

DE 19942987 A

Abstract (en)

The drilling tool has a shaft (2) with at least two spiral conveying grooves (3,4) for dust and a drill head (5) with cutters (7-9) of hard metal, which project radially from the edge of the drill head and are separated by grooves (10,12) for boring dust. There are more grooves for boring dust than there are conveying grooves into which they open. At least one groove pair (10,12) opens into a common conveying groove (4). The groove pair is connected to the conveying groove by a spiral groove section (13), whose cross-section is smaller than the common conveying groove.

Abstract (de)

Ein Bohrwerkzeug, insbesondere ein Gesteinsbohrer, umfasst einen mit einem Einsteckende versehenen Schaft (2), der wenigstens zwei wendelförmig umlaufende Abfuhrnuten (3, 4) für Bohrmehl aufweist. Am gegenüberliegenden Ende ist der Schaft (2) mit einem Bohrkopf (5) ausgestattet, der aus Hartmetall geformte Schneiden (7 - 9) aufweist, die den Umfang des Bohrkopfes (5) radial überragen. Die Hartmetallschneiden (7 - 9) sind durch Kopfmehlnuten (10 - 12) voneinander getrennt, deren Zahl grösser ist als die Zahl der wendelförmigen Abfuhrnuten (3, 4), in welche sie münden. Dadurch geht wenigstens ein Kopfmehlnutpaar (10, 12) in eine gemeinsame Abfuhrnut (4) über. Am Übergang in die gemeinsame Abfuhrnut ist das Kopfmehlnutpaar (10, 12) durch einen Spiralnutabschnitt (13) verbunden, dessen Durchgangsquerschnitt kleiner ist als der Durchgangsquerschnitt der gemeinsamen Abfuhrnut (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/00 (2006.01); B23B 51/00 (2006.01); B28D 1/14 (2006.01); E21B 10/40 (2006.01); E21B 10/44 (2006.01); E21B 10/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/58 (2013.01); E21B 10/40 (2013.01); E21B 10/445 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4903787 A 19900227 - MOSER BERNHARD [DE], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083294 A1 20010314; EP 1083294 B1 20051228; DE 19942987 A1 20010315; DE 50011953 D1 20060202; DK 1083294 T3 20060515; JP 2001105219 A 20010417; JP 4676051 B2 20110427; US 6431295 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100401

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080903

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2006-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060208

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011953

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KLEINE, WERNER

2005-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BONGERS, HANS-WERNER

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI