Global Patent Index - EP 1083313 A2

EP 1083313 A2 2001-03-14 - Throttle shaft assembly and method of attachment of said shaft to a throttle body

Title (en)

Throttle shaft assembly and method of attachment of said shaft to a throttle body

Title (de)

Drosselklappenwellenzusammenbau und Verfahren zur Befestigung dieser Welle an einem Drosselklappenstutzen

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'arbre de papillon et procédé de fixation de cet arbre à un corps de papillon

Publication

EP 1083313 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119112 A

Priority

US 15279399 P

Abstract (en)

A method and apparatus is provided for the attachment of a throttle shaft to a throttle body. A throttle shaft, a spring, and a cap retainer, are temporarily assembled as a throttle shaft subassembly. A set of locking members extend from the cap retainer to engage a set of locking surfaces adjacent the throttle shaft to retain the spring in tension. The cap retainer fits onto a boss extending from the throttle body and is lockable thereto by a set of fingers which are received into engagement recesses located on the boss. As the shaft subassembly is guided into the throttle body, the cap retainer is rotated by the engagement surfaces and the locking members are disengaged from the locking surfaces to at least partially unload the spring to mount the shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/10 (2013.01); F02D 9/107 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0269 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083313 A2 20010314; EP 1083313 A3 20010905; EP 1083313 B1 20020807; DE 60000308 D1 20020912; DE 60000308 T2 20030515

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60000308

- Effective date: 20140401

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040904

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040904

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000308 20020912

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE INC.

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02D 9/02 A, 7F 02D 9/10 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI