Global patent index - EP 1083329 A2

EP 1083329 A2 2001-03-14 - Cylinder head for watercooled internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cylinder head for watercooled internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zylinderkopf für eine wassergekühlte Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Culase pour un moteur à combustion interne refroidi par eau

Publication

EP 1083329 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116737 A

Priority

DE 19943001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19943001C1] The cylinder head for a water-cooled internal combustion motor has a flow unit (19) for additional coolant water in the coolant channel (15). It gives a targeted coolant water flow and cooling at the hot spot (17) at the wall (18) of the cylinder head (2). The flow unit (19) has one or more additional channels (20) to give the coolant flow pattern at the hot spot (17).

Abstract (de)

Dieser Zylinderkopf umfaßt an einer Wand des Zylinderkopfs wenigstens eine durch Strahlwärme eines Brennraums hervorgerufene Heißstelle. Besagte Heißstelle wird mittels einem von Kühlwasser durchströmten Kühlkanal gekühlt. Zur Optimierung der Kühlung der Heißstelle sind im Kühlkanal zusätzliche Kühlwasser führende Strömungsvorkehrungen für eine gezielte Kühlwasserströmung und Kühlung der Heißstelle an der Wand des Zylinderkopfs vorgesehen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F01P 3/02 (2006.01); F02F 1/10 (2006.01); F02F 1/40 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/40 (2013.01); F02F 2001/247 (2013.01); F02F 2001/248 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19943001 C1 20001026; DE 50012277 D1 20060427; EP 1083329 A2 20010314; EP 1083329 A3 20020130; EP 1083329 B1 20060301; ES 2254079 T3 20060616; JP 2001090604 A 20010403; US 6499444 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080804

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080804

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080803

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-08-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2254079

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060411

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50012277

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050419

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02F 1/40 A, 7F 01P 3/14 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI