Global Patent Index - EP 1083338 A2

EP 1083338 A2 2001-03-14 - Arrangement for hydraulically operating a moving element of a vehicle

Title (en)

Arrangement for hydraulically operating a moving element of a vehicle

Title (de)

Anordnung zur hydraulischen Betätigung eines beweglichen Bauteils an einem Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Agencement pour l'actionnement hydraulique d'un organe mobile d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1083338 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890274 A

Priority

AT 155299 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has at least one dual action hydraulic working cylinder (1) joined to the vehicle and to the moving part with one working vol. (3) connected to a passive pressure reservoir (4) and the other (7) to a hydraulic pump (8). A non-return valve (11) between the working cylinder and pump is blocking towards the pump and a line to the tank (9) that branches off between the non-return valve and working cylinder contains an electrically driven proportional pressure valve (13) as a pressure limiting valve. An Independent claim is also included for a method of hydraulic actuation of a movable part in a vehicle.

Abstract (de)

Eine Anordnung zur hydraulischen Betätigung eines beweglichen Bauteils an einem Fahrzeug, beispielsweise eines Heckdeckels, einer Abdeckklappe od. dgl., weist zumindest einen doppeltwirkenden hydraulischen Arbeitszylinder (1), der einerseits am Fahrzeug und andererseits an der Abdeckklappe angelenkt ist, auf, wobei einer von seinen Arbeitsräumen (3) mit einem passiven Druckspeicher (4) und der andere Arbeitsraum (7) mit einer Hydraulikpumpe (8) verbunden ist, und wobei zwischen Pumpe und Arbeitszylinder eine Leitung zum Tank (9) abzweigt, in welche ein Druckbegrenzungsventil eingesetzt ist. Um insbesonders auf einfache und sichere Weise die Gefahr von Verletzungen von Personen oder die Beschädigungsgefahr für Fahrzeug oder andere Gegenstände zu vermindern, ist zwischen Pumpe (8) und Arbeitszylinder (1) ein in Richtung zur Pumpe (8) sperrendes Rückschlagventil (11) eingesetzt, und zweigt zwischen diesem Rückschlagventil (11) und dem Arbeitszylinder (1) eine Leitung zum Tank (9) ab, in welche ein elektrisch ansteuerbares Proportionaldruckventil (13) als Druckbegrenzungsventil eingesetzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/028; F15B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/028 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/1476 (2013.01); F15B 11/028 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20538 (2013.01); F15B 2211/212 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40507 (2013.01); F15B 2211/41509 (2013.01); F15B 2211/41581 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50536 (2013.01); F15B 2211/515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5159 (2013.01); F15B 2211/55 (2013.01); F15B 2211/625 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7053 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083338 A2 20010314; EP 1083338 A3 20030924; AT 408475 B 20011227; AT A155299 A 20010415; US 6385969 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-07-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI