Global patent index - EP 1083385 A2

EP 1083385 A2 2001-03-14 - Steam generator

Title (en)

Steam generator

Title (de)

Dampferzeuger

Title (fr)

Générateur de vapeur

Publication

EP 1083385 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118720 A

Priority

DE 19942767 A

Abstract (en)

The steam generator has several dust burners (4) arranged one on top of another, with a removable oil lance arranged in each one and one or more chimney gas flues (3), connected to an air preheater (6) supported to a frame (12). The smoke exit connections (9) are connected to the preheaters by a distributor line (20) with an electrofilter (16). The electrofilter has a filter casing (17) and one or more entry hoods (18). The distributor line is arranged vertically beneath the smoke exit connections of the air preheaters. The air preheater above is arranged above the removal area of the oil lances.

Abstract (de)

Ein Dampferzeuger ist mit mehreren übereinander angeordneten Staubbrennern (4) versehen, in denen ausbaubar jeweils eine Öllanze angeordnet ist. Der Dampferzeuger weist weiterhin einen oder mehrere Rauchgaszüge (3) auf, an den sich ein von Rauchgas durchströmter und von einem Gerüst (12) getragener Luftvorwärmer (6) anschließt. Der Rauchgasaustrittsstutzen (9) des Luftvorwärmers (6) ist über eine Verteilerleitung (20) mit einem Elektrofilter (16) verbunden, der mit einem Filtergehäuse (17) und einer oder mehreren Eintrittshauben (18) versehen ist. Die Verteilerleitung (20) ist vertikal und unterhalb des Rauchgasaustrittsstutzens (9) des Luftvorwärmers (6) angeordnet, und der Luftvorwärmer (6) befindet sich oberhalb des Ausbaubereiches der Öllanzen der Staubbrenner (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 31/08; F22B 33/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 15/00 (2006.01); F22B 31/08 (2006.01); F22B 33/18 (2006.01); F22B 37/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 37/24 (2013.01); F22B 31/08 (2013.01); F22B 33/18 (2013.01); Y10S 122/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

VGB KRAFTSWERKSTECHNIK 73 (1993), pages 917 - 932

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083385 A2 20010314; EP 1083385 A3 20020320; DE 19942767 A1 20010315; HU 0003545 A2 20010528; HU 0003545 D0 20000907; JP 2001090935 A 20010403; PL 342310 A1 20010312; US 6253714 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070216

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20020305;LT PAYMENT 20020305;LV PAYMENT 20020305;MK PAYMENT 20020305;RO PAYMENT 20000830;SI PAYMENT 20020305

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20000830;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20000830;SI