Global Patent Index - EP 1083388 A1

EP 1083388 A1 2001-03-14 - Telescopic linkage for domestic devices

Title (en)

Telescopic linkage for domestic devices

Title (de)

Teleskopgestänge für Haushaltsgeräte

Title (fr)

Tringlerie télescopique pour des appareils de ménage

Publication

EP 1083388 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117670 A

Priority

EP 99117670 A

Abstract (en)

Two long telescopic sections (2, 8) can be turned through a limited angle of rotation ( beta ) relative to one another, around their common longitudinal axis. This takes them from an axially-locked orientation, to a released, axially-free orientation. The pair can be at least locked against axial motion, and can also be locked in relative rotation with each other. By turning back in the opposite direction they are released again.

Abstract (de)

Teleskopgestänge, insbesondere für Gaskochstellen. Ein Arretiermechanismus (12) zwischen zwei in Längsrichtung ineinander gefügten Teleskoplängskörpern (2, 8) kann durch manuelles Verdrehen am einen Gestängeende wahlweise geöffnet werden zur Längenveränderung des Teleskopgestänges oder zur Sicherung gegen unbefugtes oder unbeabsichtigtes Einschalten eines Haushaltsgerätes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/12; G05G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/12 (2006.01); G05G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/126 (2013.01); G05G 7/10 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18056 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0718745 A2 19960626 - BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083388 A1 20010314; EP 1083388 B1 20040218; DE 59908587 D1 20040325; ES 2216396 T3 20041016; TR 200200469 T2 20020722; US 2002153461 A1 20021024; US 6715483 B2 20040406; WO 0118454 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908587

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2005-02-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216396 T3

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908587 P 20040325

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021009

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI