Global patent index - EP 1083390 A2

EP 1083390 A2 2001-03-14 - Air conditioner having dehumidifying and ventilating functions

Title (en)

Air conditioner having dehumidifying and ventilating functions

Title (de)

Klimaanlage mit Funktionen zur Entfeuchtung und Belüftung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air avec ventilation et déshumidification

Publication

EP 1083390 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119509 A

Priority

  • JP 25262499 A
  • JP 25262599 A
  • JP 25262699 A
  • JP 2000010170 A

Abstract (en)

In order to solve the problems of ventilation and dehumidifying of an air conditioner, the air conditioner includes a refrigerant circuit formed by coupling at least a compressor (7), an indoor heat exchanger (4), a decompressor (8) and an outdoor heat exchanger (6), a humidifying/dehumidifying apparatus (10, 11, 12, 13, 14) provided separate from the refrigerant circuit, for removing moisture in the room, a moisture detection sensor (31) for detecting indoor moisture, and a control unit (34) for switching an operation mode based on the moisture detected by the moisture detection sensor (31). The humidifying/dehumidifying apparatus (10, 11, 12, 13, 14) guides the sucked indoor air to a path communicated to the room and a path communicated to the outside of the room in a ventilation mode (37, 35), and guides the sucked indoor air to the outside of the room in a dehumidifying mode. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 3/14 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/1423 (2013.01); F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 11/0001 (2013.01); F24F 11/0015 (2013.01); F24F 2203/1012 (2013.01); F24F 2203/1016 (2013.01); F24F 2203/1036 (2013.01); F24F 2203/1056 (2013.01); F24F 2203/1068 (2013.01); F24F 2203/1084 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083390 A2 20010314; EP 1083390 A3 20021204; AU 5653800 A 20010308; AU 768635 B2 20031218; CN 100338401 C 20070919; CN 1287250 A 20010314

INPADOC legal status

2011-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110215

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050616

2003-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 24F 3/14 A, 7F 24F 11/00 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI