EP 1083390 A3 20021204 - Air conditioner having dehumidifying and ventilating functions
Title (en)
Air conditioner having dehumidifying and ventilating functions
Title (de)
Klimaanlage mit Funktionen zur Entfeuchtung und Belüftung
Title (fr)
Dispositif de conditionnement d'air avec ventilation et déshumidification
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 25262499 A 19990907
- JP 25262599 A 19990907
- JP 25262699 A 19990907
- JP 2000010170 A 20000114
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1083390A2] In order to solve the problems of ventilation and dehumidifying of an air conditioner, the air conditioner includes a refrigerant circuit formed by coupling at least a compressor (7), an indoor heat exchanger (4), a decompressor (8) and an outdoor heat exchanger (6), a humidifying/dehumidifying apparatus (10, 11, 12, 13, 14) provided separate from the refrigerant circuit, for removing moisture in the room, a moisture detection sensor (31) for detecting indoor moisture, and a control unit (34) for switching an operation mode based on the moisture detected by the moisture detection sensor (31). The humidifying/dehumidifying apparatus (10, 11, 12, 13, 14) guides the sucked indoor air to a path communicated to the room and a path communicated to the outside of the room in a ventilation mode (37, 35), and guides the sucked indoor air to the outside of the room in a dehumidifying mode. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F24F 1/00 (2006.01); F24F 1/0071 (2019.01); F24F 3/14 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
F24F 1/0071 (2019.01 - EP US); F24F 3/1423 (2013.01 - EP); F24F 11/0001 (2013.01 - EP); F24F 11/65 (2017.12 - EP US); F24F 11/30 (2017.12 - EP); F24F 2110/20 (2017.12 - EP); F24F 2203/1012 (2013.01 - EP); F24F 2203/1016 (2013.01 - EP); F24F 2203/1036 (2013.01 - EP); F24F 2203/1056 (2013.01 - EP); F24F 2203/1068 (2013.01 - EP); F24F 2203/1084 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [XAY] US 4474021 A 19841002 - HARBAND JOEL [IL]
- [YA] EP 0892330 A1 19990120 - JOHNSON SERVICE CO [US]
- [Y] DE 19628735 A1 19980122 - HOFFMANN HANS [DE]
- [XA] CN 1226663 A 19990825 - SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR] & US 6145328 A 20001114 - CHOI KWANG-SOO [KR]
- [A] US 4916909 A 19900417 - MATHUR ANOOP [US], et al
- [A] CA 2211746 A1 19990219 - VALLIERES NORMAND [CA], et al
- [A] DE 2210473 B1 19730906
- [A] US 5448895 A 19950912 - COELLNER JAMES A [US], et al
- [A] US 5070931 A 19911210 - KALTHOFF GERD-OTTO [US], et al
- [A] US 5775406 A 19980707 - GHITEA JR NICOLAE [US]
- [A] US 4971136 A 19901120 - MATHUR ANOOP [US], et al
- [A] US 4716957 A 19880105 - THOMPSON PETER [JP], et al
- [A] US 5924486 A 19990720 - EHLERS GREGORY A [US], et al
- [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 09 30 July 1999 (1999-07-30)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 09 30 July 1999 (1999-07-30)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 155 (M - 0954) 26 March 1990 (1990-03-26)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 09 30 July 1999 (1999-07-30)
- [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 14 22 December 1999 (1999-12-22)
- [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 10 17 November 2000 (2000-11-17)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 02 28 February 1997 (1997-02-28)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 11 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 09 30 July 1999 (1999-07-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 047 (C - 403) 13 February 1987 (1987-02-13)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1083390 A2 20010314; EP 1083390 A3 20021204; AU 5653800 A 20010308; AU 768635 B2 20031218; CN 100338401 C 20070919; CN 1287250 A 20010314
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00119509 A 20000906; AU 5653800 A 20000906; CN 00126344 A 20000907