Global Patent Index - EP 1083399 A1

EP 1083399 A1 2001-03-14 - Mobile device, in particular wheeled or tracked vehicle for the military

Title (en)

Mobile device, in particular wheeled or tracked vehicle for the military

Title (de)

Ortsveränderliches Objekt, insbesondere militärisches Rad-oder Kettenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif mobile, en particulier véhicule militaire à roues ou à chenilles

Publication

EP 1083399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116512 A

Priority

DE 19935574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19935574A1] The vehicle has at least parts of its armor (3) formed to receive, store and supply an energy carrier, which generates electrical energy to supply loads on or in the vehicle. The electrical energy is generated by a fuel cell. At least part of an armored segment is formed as a fuel store to supply the fuel cell. Preferably, the fuel is hydrogen and the fuel store is a metal hydride or FeTi.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein ortsveränderliches Objekt, insbesondere ein militärisches Rad- oder Kettenfahrzeug mit einer im Außenbereich des Objektes vorgesehenen Panzerung, die hinsichtlich ihrer Funktionsvielfalt erweitert werden soll. Erfindungagemäß wird dies erreicht, indem zumindest Teile (3,4) der Panzerung zur Aufnahme, Speicherung und Abgabe eines Energieträgers ausgebildet sind, der der Energiegewinnung elektrischer Energie zur Versorgung von im oder am ortsveränderlichen Objekt befindlichen Verbrauchern dient. Der Zusammenfassung ist Fig. 3 zugeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 7/04; F41H 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3729212 C1 19990318 - DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19935574 A1 20010208; EP 1083399 A1 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI