Global Patent Index - EP 1083400 A2

EP 1083400 A2 2001-03-14 - Adaptive camouflage for targets

Title (en)

Adaptive camouflage for targets

Title (de)

Adaptive Tarnung für Ziele

Title (fr)

Camouflage adaptif pour des cibles

Publication

EP 1083400 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118247 A

Priority

DE 19943186 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves directing short wavelength light from external light sources (2) onto the visible surface (1) of the target, which is coated with a material that converts the short wavelength light into long wavelength light. The coating has fluorescent properties.

Abstract (de)

Zur Tarnung von Zielen, wie Fahrzeugen, Schiffen oder Fluggeräten, wird Licht kurzwelliger Lichtquellen (2) von innen oder außen auf die sichtbare Oberfläche des Ziels gestrahlt, welches nach Umwandlung in langwelligeres Licht von externen Sensoren (3) erfaßt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41J 2/00; F41H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3401919 A1 19850725 - STRASSER BERND

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083400 A2 20010314; EP 1083400 A3 20021023; EP 1083400 B1 20051116; DE 19943186 A1 20010726; DE 19943186 C2 20020620; DE 50011612 D1 20051222; DE 50011833 D1 20060112; EP 1245920 A2 20021002; EP 1245920 A3 20021009; EP 1245920 B1 20051207; ES 2247995 T3 20060316; ES 2251543 T3 20060501

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150904

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150905

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150904

2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150904

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50011612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140918

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-09-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEFENCE AND SPACE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50011612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140814

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2247995

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-03-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 41J 2/00 A, 7F 41H 3/02 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI