Global Patent Index - EP 1083579 A2

EP 1083579 A2 2001-03-14 - Arrester

Title (en)

Arrester

Title (de)

Überspannungsableiter

Title (fr)

Limiteur de surtension

Publication

EP 1083579 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810723 A

Priority

DE 19942633 A

Abstract (en)

The overvoltage diverter has an earthed cylindrical housing (10) receiving a HV terminal (5) and enclosing an active part (8) extending along its longitudinal axis, provided with at least one varistor element (9), held in contact with opposing end terminations (1,2) via a tensioning loop passed around the latter. The active part is insulated from the cylindrical housing via an insulation sleeve (13), with a current conductor (3) fitting through a necked section of the housing between one of the end terminations and the HV terminal.

Abstract (de)

Der Überspannungsableiter weist ein zylindersymmetrisch ausgebildetes, erdbares Gehäuse (10) auf, durch welches ein auf Hochspannungspotential bringbarer Steckanschluss (5) geführt ist. Im Gehäuse (10) ist ein längs der Symmetrieachse (z) ausgerichtetes Aktivteil (8) angeordnet mit zwei Anschlussarmaturen (1, 2) und mindestens einem zwischen den beiden Anschlussarmaturen angeordneten Varistorelement (9). Die Anschlussarmaturen (1, 2) und das mindestens eine Varistorelement (9) sind unter Bildung von Kontaktkraft mit mindestens einer Schlaufe (7) gegeneinander verspannt. Die Isolation des Aktivteils (8) zum Gehäuse (10) ist durch eine Isolierstoffhülle (13) sichergestellt. Das Gehäuse (10) ist flaschenförmig ausgebildet ist und weist einen nach Art eines Flaschenhalses ausgebildeten Gehäuseabschnitt (14) auf, in dem ein an eine (1) der beiden Anschlussarmaturen angeschlossener und mit dem Steckanschluss (5) elektrisch leitend verbundener, zylindersymmetrisch ausgebildeter Stromleiter (3) geführt ist. Dieser Überspannungsableiter zeichnet sich durch grosse mechanische Festigkeit aus. Durch die flaschenförmige Gestalt des Gehäuses (10) wird eine Ausbildung des elektrischen Feldes im Gehäuseinneren erreicht, welche auch bei nichtzylindersymmetrischer Beschaffenheit des Aktivteils (8) feldsteuernde, halbleitende und/oder leitende Elemente und/oder Beschichtungen zwischen dem Aktivteil (8) und der Wand des Gehäuses (10) entbehrlich macht. Zugleich zeichnet sich der Überspannungsableiter wegen des mechanisch sehr beständigen Aktivteils (8) und wegen der fehlenden feldsteuernden Elemente durch eine hervorragende Langzeitstabilität aus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19942633 A1 20010308; AT 320072 T 20060315; BR 0003990 A 20010403; DE 50012362 D1 20060504; EP 1083579 A2 20010314; EP 1083579 A3 20041215; EP 1083579 B1 20060308; HR P20000581 A2 20010831; HU 0003510 A2 20010730; HU 0003510 A3 20020828; HU 0003510 D0 20000906; JP 2001118707 A 20010427; JP 4555447 B2 20100929; PL 342384 A1 20010312; US 6594133 B1 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140815

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140815

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130815

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060815

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060609

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ABB SCHWEIZ A.G.

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060815

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060808

2006-06-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060619

2006-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060523

2006-06-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-06-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012362 P 20060504

2006-04-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-03-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-03-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-03-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060308

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050509

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI