Global Patent Index - EP 1083585 A2

EP 1083585 A2 2001-03-14 - Electromagnetic trip device

Title (en)

Electromagnetic trip device

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer Auslöser

Title (fr)

Déclencheur électromagnétique

Publication

EP 1083585 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119078 A

Priority

DE 29915698 U

Abstract (en)

Housed in a casing (11) are a U-shaped yoke, a permanent magnet, a coil and a cutout blade kept ready for trip-out by being pulled against the yoke by the permanent magnet against the force of a spring. The cutout blade is coupled to a pin (19) jutting out from the casing that acts on a latch position in the switch latch of a fault current safety switch. A magnetic plate acts as partial shielding (20) round the casing.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein elektromagnetischer Auslöser (10) für einen Fehlerstromschutzschalter beschrieben, der ein Gehäuse (11) aus Kunststoff, in dem ein Joch, ein Permanentmagnet, eine Spule und ein Anker, der im auslösebereiten Zustand entgegen der Kraft einer Feder vom Permanentmagneten gegen das Joch gezogen wird, untergebracht sind, aufweist. Der Anker ist mit einem aus dem Gehäuse herausragenden Stift gekoppelt, der beim Auslösevorgang auf eine Verklinkungsstelle in einem Schaltschloß des Fehlerstromschutzschalters einwirkt. Damit eine magnetische Beeinflussung des Auslösers von außen vermieden ist, ist das Gehäuse (11) von einem magnetischen Blech als Abschirmung (20) wenigstens teilweise umgeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/32 (2006.01); H01H 50/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/325 (2013.01); H01H 50/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29915698 U1 20000511; EP 1083585 A2 20010314; EP 1083585 A3 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20000919

- Countries: SI

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000919

2002-10-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 71/32 A, 7H 01H 50/10 B

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000919