Global Patent Index - EP 1083609 A1

EP 1083609 A1 2001-03-14 - Method of fabricating thermoelectric sensor

Title (en)

Method of fabricating thermoelectric sensor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines thermoelektrischen Sensors

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un senseur thermoélectrique

Publication

EP 1083609 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99117879 A

Priority

  • EP 99117879 A
  • US 39257499 A

Abstract (en)

A thermoelectric sensor device is disclosed consisting of polysilicon, titanium or AlSiCu as the thermocouple of material for thermoelectric sensor device. The features of the present process are: Selecting a material such as aluminum, titanium, aluminum alloy or titanium alloy with lower thermal conductivity coefficient as thermocouple element line and making use of zigzag structure with thermocouple element line, and increasing the length of thermocouple element line. Employing front side Si bulk etching technique to etch the silicon substrate, which is under the device and empty of silicon substrate, so as to reduce the superficial measure of thermoelectric sensor module and increase the throughout of the silicon wafer. Simultaneously, fabricating a resistor to treat as a heater on the membrane for adjusting the device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 35/08; H01L 35/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01J 5/12 (2006.01); H01L 35/32 (2006.01); H01L 35/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 35/32 (2013.01); G01J 5/12 (2013.01); H01L 35/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YA] WO 9416464 A1 19940721 - KINARD JOSEPH R [US], et al
  • [A] FR 2398389 A1 19790216 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 498 (P - 1124) 30 October 1990 (1990-10-30)
  • [YA] MULLER M ET AL: "A FULLY CMOS-COMPATIBLE INFRARED SENSOR FABRICATED ON SIMOX SUBSTRATES", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, vol. A42, no. 1/03, 15 April 1994 (1994-04-15), pages 538 - 541, XP000449977, ISSN: 0924-4247
  • [DA] T. AKIN ET AL: "An integrated thermopile structure with high responsivity using any standard CMOS process", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, vol. a66, 1998, Lausanne,CH, pages 218 - 224, XP002130215
  • [DA] H. BALTES: "CMOS as sensor technology", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, vol. A37-38, 1993, Lausanne,CH, pages 51 - 56, XP002130216
  • [A] VAN HERWAARDEN A W ET AL: "INTEGRATED THERMOPILE SENSORS", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, vol. A22, no. 1 / 03, 1 March 1990 (1990-03-01), pages 621 - 630, XP000358506, ISSN: 0924-4247

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083609 A1 20010314; US 6300554 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-31 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010904

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI