Global Patent Index - EP 1083627 A1

EP 1083627 A1 2001-03-14 - Electrical connector assembly

Title (en)

Electrical connector assembly

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbinderbaugruppe mit Flachkabel

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1083627 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117791 A

Priority

EP 99117791 A

Abstract (en)

Connector componentry includes a dielectric connector casing (10), multiple contacts and a foil conductor (30). Conductors on a flat cable are soldered or crimped to the contacts. Since conventional mains lead cleats like clips do not work because of the flat surface and a tendency to tear the foil conductor insulating material such as polyester, insulation for the flat cable is bonded to the connector casing in order to relieve strain on electrical joints.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine elektrische Verbinderbaugruppe mit einem Flachkabel und einer Zugentlastung sowie ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Kombination aus Verbinder und Flachkabel. Die Verbinderbaugruppe umfaßt ein dielektrisches Verbindergehäuse, eine Mehrzahl von Kontakten und ein Flachkabel, insbesondere einen Folienleiter. Die Leiter des Flachkabels sind jeweils elektrisch mit den Kontakten verbunden, z.B. gelötet, geschweißt oder gekrimpt. Da herkömmliche Zugentlastungstechniken, wie z.B. Klemmen oder Durchstechen wegen der glatten Oberfläche und der Rißempfindlichkeit des Isolationsmaterials der Folienleiter (z.B. Polyester) versagen, ist die Isolation des Flachkabels mit dem Verbindergehäuse verschweißt, um die elektrische Verbindungsstelle zugzuentlasten. Die Schweißverbindung wird in einfacher Weise z.B. durch Laser-, Ultraschall- oder Widerstandsschweißen erzeugt. Gemäß dem erfindungsgemäßen Verfahren können die elektrische und die mechanische Verbindung in einem Arbeitsschritt hergestellt werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 4/02 (2006.01); H01R 12/70 (2011.01); H01R 43/00 (2006.01); H01R 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/029 (2013.01); H01R 23/661 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083627 A1 20010314; EP 1083627 B1 20050810; BR 0007346 A 20010918; CN 1289159 A 20010328; DE 59912400 D1 20050915; ES 2244131 T3 20051201; JP 2001203015 A 20010727

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912400

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060911

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060911

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060910

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244131 T3

2005-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912400 P 20050915

2005-08-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI