Global Patent Index - EP 1083634 A2

EP 1083634 A2 2001-03-14 - Connectors for flexible circuit

Title (en)

Connectors for flexible circuit

Title (de)

Verbinder für flexible Schaltung

Title (fr)

Connecteurs pour circuit souple

Publication

EP 1083634 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00118229 A

Priority

  • FR 9911323 A
  • FR 9911325 A

Abstract (en)

The connector for a flexible circuit (10) comprises a casing (1) with at least one row of longitudinal cells for accommodation of contacts (6), a cap (5) adjustable between the positions of a pre-insertion of contacts and locking, where the cap comprises means for support and position constraint in the form of stubs (31), and each stub in the locked position is supported on a connection part (22) in contact with the flexible circuit. The contacts also comprise aligned setting crowns, and the stubs (31) are supported between the crowns, for an improved connection. The cells in the form of longitudinal cavities are separated by projections or ridges (40), so that the contacts are in the position of full insertion, and the flexible circuit is supported on the ridges by the action of stubs (31). The cap and the casing also comprise complementary means for the retention in locked position. The contact comprises a terminal support constituted by a shutter, and the cap comprises a finger for complementary retention of contact in conjunction with the shutter for locking the contact in the corresponding cell when the cap is in final position. The casing also comprises, on at least one lateral face at the level of rear part of the reception of contacts, an opening which allows a deformation of the flexible circuit. The support system also comprises at least one lateral wall (11) of cap which is designed to deform the flexible circuit at the level of insertion zone when in locked position. The opening is of V-form profile, open towards rear. The lateral wall has an inclined edge, so that the deformation of flexible circuit has a rounded profile (15) with the maximum curvature at the extremity of flexible circuit when inserted in casing. The lateral wall of casing at the level of opening is in the form of lower and upper half-walls (13,14), where the upper half-wall extends laterally beyond the lower half-wall, and forms also a support surface for a lateral wall of cap.

Abstract (fr)

Connecteur pour circuit souple (10), comportant un boîtier (1) muni d'au moins une rangée d'alvéoles longitudinales de réception de contacts (6), un capot (5) manoeuvrable entre une position de pré-insertion des contacts et une position de verrouillage des contacts, le capot comportant au moins un moyen d'appui et de mise en contrainte du circuit souple. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436; H01R 4/24; H01R 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/00 (2006.01); H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 12/89 (2011.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 12/77 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/89 (2013.01); H01R 12/772 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083634 A2 20010314; EP 1083634 A3 20020327; FR 2798229 A1 20010309; FR 2798229 B1 20011012; FR 2798230 A1 20010309; FR 2798230 B1 20011012

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070515

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070103

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI