Global Patent Index - EP 1083670 A2

EP 1083670 A2 2001-03-14 - Casing for a mobile telephone

Title (en)

Casing for a mobile telephone

Title (de)

Futteral für Mobiltelefon

Title (fr)

Etui d'un téléphone mobile

Publication

EP 1083670 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810785 A

Priority

CH 161999 A

Abstract (en)

The case (5) has an internal vol. into which the telephone (1) is inserted and in which it is held by a fixing arrangement and an antenna (6) held on the case by an attachment arrangement and that can be connected to the telephone by a connection arrangement. The arrangement for attaching the antenna to the case has a rotary arm bearing that allows pivoting of the antenna over a predefined angle wrt. the wall (23) of the case to which the antenna is attached.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegenden Erfindung betrifft ein schützendes Futteral (5) für ein Mobiltelefon (1). Das Futteral ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass es Mittel zur Befestigung (21) der Antenne (6) aufweist, die in solcher Weise ausgelegt sind, dass die Antenne (6) über einen solchen Winkel in die Arbeitsstellung ausgeschwenkt werden kann, dass sie in solcher Weise zum Kopf des Benutzers im rechten Winkel ausgerichtet ist, dass die elektromagnetischen Emissionen vom Benutzer weg gerichtet und weniger schädlich sind. Ferner weist das Futteral (5) gemäss einer bevorzugten Ausführungsvariante eingebaute Mittel zur Abschirmung (7) auf, die den Benutzer zusätzlich gegen die elektromagnetischen Emissionen abschirmen. Das Futteral (5) kann sowohl zum Schutz der neu konstruierter Telefone als auch für jene, die schon auf dem Markt sind und keine besonderen Einrichtungen zum Schutz des Benutzers gegen die elektromagnetische Abstrahlung aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 3/06 (2006.01); H04B 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/245 (2013.01); H01Q 1/084 (2013.01); H01Q 3/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083670 A2 20010314; EP 1083670 A3 20011128

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04B 1/38 A, 7H 01Q 1/24 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI