Global Patent Index - EP 1083731 A2

EP 1083731 A2 2001-03-14 - Telephone calls routing system

Title (en)

Telephone calls routing system

Title (de)

Telephonanrufen Leitweglenkungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de routage d'appels téléphoniques

Publication

EP 1083731 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00500198 A

Priority

ES 9901999 A

Abstract (en)

System for routing telephone calls has a microprocessor (16) and a number of peripherals so that telephone calls can be made via the operator, from a number of operators, that offers the best tariff as a function of time, date and destination. In addition the time for each routed call can be recorded in addition with the operator used in order to provide a real cost for the call that can be entered in accounts. The total for all calls is summed to give a total call cost. Microprocessor (16) can link to databases (13), has interfaces such as screen and keyboard. It controls telephone lines (15) using a multiplexor (8) and a memory selector (9).

Abstract (fr)

Système de routage d'appels téléphoniques qui, se servant d'un microprocesseur (16) et de plusieurs périphériques permet de faire des appels téléphoniques par l'intermédiare de l'opérateur qui offre le meilleur tarif en fonction de l'heure, la date et la destination de ceux-ci. Ce système permet aussi de comptabiliser le temps de chacun des appels routés et, lui associant le tarif que l'opérateur possède pour chacun de ces appels, fournir le coût réel de ceux-ci; un compteur général où s'additionnent ces montants fournit une prévision réelle des frais téléphoniques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/30 (2013.01); H04M 15/00 (2013.01); H04M 15/8044 (2013.01); H04M 2215/42 (2013.01); H04M 2215/745 (2013.01); H04M 2215/92 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083731 A2 20010314; EP 1083731 A3 20011219; ES 2155039 A1 20010416; ES 2155039 B1 20011101

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-10-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI