Global Patent Index - EP 1083745 A1

EP 1083745 A1 2001-03-14 - Remote control device

Title (en)

Remote control device

Title (de)

Fernsteuerungvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande à distance

Publication

EP 1083745 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00307587 A

Priority

GB 9920990 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a remote control device which has the ability to indicate to the user and/or select a previously selected function of electrical apparatus which can be controlled via the remote control device thereby allowing the user to return to the function. The remote control device is provided for use in conjunction with electrical apparatus such as a television set and/or broadcast data receiver, to control functions of the same in response to user manipulation of the remote control. The remote control device includes a plurality of actuating means for selection by the user to determine the configuration of the control signal transmitted from the device and at least one actuation means when selected causes a function of the electrical apparatus at that time to be held in a memory provided in the device and/or electrical apparatus and/or an indication to be generated to the user to represent that function. This then allows the user to change and select functions but still be able to easily return to the original function on the basis of the memory information and/or indication..

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/44; H04N 5/445

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/44 (2011.01); H04N 5/445 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/44 (2013.01); H04N 5/44582 (2013.01); H04N 21/42208 (2013.01); H04N 21/4221 (2013.01); H04N 2005/4408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083745 A1 20010314; GB 9920990 D0 19991110

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070619

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061206

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI