Global Patent Index - EP 1083774 A2

EP 1083774 A2 2001-03-14 - Lighting device with Leds

Title (en)

Lighting device with Leds

Title (de)

LED-Leuchte

Title (fr)

Luminaire à diodes électroluminescentes

Publication

EP 1083774 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119068 A

Priority

DE 19943345 A

Abstract (en)

An LED lamp (1) has one more lamp diodes (2a) as a source of light and a cutout circuit. It also has a temperature sensor (11) for measuring environmental temperature and one or more switching devices for switching off the lamp diode if a preset temperature threshold value is exceeded.

Abstract (de)

Eine LED-Leuchte (1) für Kraftfahrzeuge, weist als Lichtquelle mindestens eine Leuchtdiode (2a) auf, für die eine Schutzschaltung vorgesehen ist. Diese hat wenigstens einen Temperaturfühler (11) zur Messung der Umgebungstemperatur und mindestens ein Schaltmittel zum Abschalten der Leuchdiode(n) (2a) beim Überschreiten eines vorgegebenen Temperaturschwellwertes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 33/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/089 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1083774 A2 20010314; EP 1083774 A3 20020130; DE 19943345 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 05B 33/08 A, 7H 02H 5/04 B

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI