Global Patent Index - EP 1083787 A1

EP 1083787 A1 2001-03-21 - FEEDING FENCE FOR CATTLE

Title (en)

FEEDING FENCE FOR CATTLE

Title (de)

FRESSGITTER FÜR VIEH

Title (fr)

CORNADIS D'AFFOURAGEMENT POUR ANIMAUX D'ELEVAGE

Publication

EP 1083787 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99913742 A

Priority

  • NL 9900195 W
  • NL 1008797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951085A1] The invention relates to a feeding fence (1) intended for animals of a specific category of livestock. The fence comprises at least one beam (4) and a number of standing bars (5, 6) arranged theron, a pair of which bounds in each case a feeding location (7) for an animal. The pair of bars has a curved form adapted to the brisket of animals of this category, whereby this feeding fence (1) results in an increase in the comfort of the animals and moreover prevents physical damage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 1/06; A01K 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 1/06 (2006.01); A01K 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 1/10 (2013.01); A01K 1/0606 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951085A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951085 A1 19991014; AU 3173799 A 19991025; CA 2326984 A1 19991014; EP 1083787 A1 20010321; NL 1008797 C2 19991005

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-20 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030617

2004-02-25 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021206

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR GB IE NL