Global patent index - EP 1083797 A1

EP 1083797 A1 2001-03-21 - ACID AND SOLVENT MODIFICATION OF PSYLLIUM

Title (en)

ACID AND SOLVENT MODIFICATION OF PSYLLIUM

Title (de)

MODIFIZIERUNG VON PSYLLIUM MITTELS SÄUREN UND LÖSUNGSMITTELN

Title (fr)

MODIFICATION DE PSYLLIUM PAR ACIDE ET PAR SOLVANT

Publication

EP 1083797 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927266 A

Priority

  • US 9912593 W
  • US 8831798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962342A1] Modified psyllium having decreased gel hardness is prepared by exposing raw psyllium to an agent that modifies non-starch polysaccharides of psyllium for a sufficient period of time such that the recovered product has a gel hardness less than that of the starting raw psyllium or does not form a gel at all. Compositions containing the modified psyllium are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 65/00; A01N 43/04; A23C 1/10; A23K 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23K 1/14 (2006.01); A23K 1/16 (2006.01); A23L 1/0526 (2006.01); A23L 1/308 (2006.01); A23L 2/52 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23K 20/163 (2016.05); A23K 10/30 (2016.05); A23L 2/52 (2013.01); A23L 29/238 (2016.08); A23L 33/21 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962342 A1 19991209; WO 9962342 A9 20000309; AU 4421199 A 19991220; AU 767576 B2 20031120; CA 2317776 A1 19991209; EP 1083797 A1 20010321; EP 1083797 A4 20010808; NO 20003407 D0 20000629; NZ 506197 A 20030328; PL 342185 A1 20010521

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040709

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF MICHIGAN STATE UNIVERSITY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YU, LIANGLI DEPT.OF FOOD SCIENCE AND HUMAN NUTRI.

2001-08-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 23C 1/10 A, 7A 23K 1/10 B, 7A 23L 1/0526 B

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000728

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE