Global Patent Index - EP 1083876 A1

EP 1083876 A1 2001-03-21 - SMALL MOLECULE SULFONAMIDE HAIR GROWTH COMPOSITIONS AND USES

Title (en)

SMALL MOLECULE SULFONAMIDE HAIR GROWTH COMPOSITIONS AND USES

Title (de)

HAARWUCHSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN BASIEREND AUF KLEINEN SULFONAMID-MOLEKULEN UND ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS POUR LA CROISSANCE DES CHEVEUX A BASE DE PETITES MOLECULES DE SULFONAMIDES ET UTILISATION DE CES COMPOSITIONS

Publication

EP 1083876 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926183 A

Priority

US 9811253 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962490A1] This invention relates to pharmaceutical compositions and methods for treating alopecia and promoting hair growth using small molecule sulfonamides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48; A61K 31/18; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/445

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 211/96 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 31/18 (2006.01); A61K 31/401 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61P 17/14 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/02 (2006.01); A61Q 7/00 (2006.01); C07D 207/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/401 (2013.01); A61K 8/466 (2013.01); A61K 8/4926 (2013.01); A61K 31/18 (2013.01); A61K 31/4439 (2013.01); A61K 31/445 (2013.01); A61Q 7/00 (2013.01); A61K 2800/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962490A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962490 A1 19991209; AU 760663 B2 20030522; AU 7808098 A 19991220; CA 2334395 A1 19991209; EP 1083876 A1 20010321; JP 2002516846 A 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050107

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021128

2001-07-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAMILTON, GREGORY, S.

2001-07-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEINER, JOSEPH, P.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAMILTON, GREGORY, S.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEINER, JOSEPH, P.

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001220;LT PAYMENT 20001220;LV PAYMENT 20001220;MK PAYMENT 20001220;RO PAYMENT 20001220;SI PAYMENT 20001220