Global Patent Index - EP 1083935 A1

EP 1083935 A1 2001-03-21 - PROSTHETIC IMPLANT AND METHODS OF USE FOR THERAPEUTIC GENE EXPRESSION

Title (en)

PROSTHETIC IMPLANT AND METHODS OF USE FOR THERAPEUTIC GENE EXPRESSION

Title (de)

PROSTHETISCHES IMPLANTAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR THERAPEUTISCHE GENEXPRESSION

Title (fr)

IMPLANT PROTHETIQUE ET TECHNIQUES D'UTILISATION AUX FINS DE L'EXPRESSION DE GENES THERAPEUTIQUES

Publication

EP 1083935 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927128 A

Priority

  • US 9912116 W
  • US 8765998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962562A1] The invention provides a method of systemic delivery of a gene product to an individual. The method consists of implanting within the wall of the digestive tract of an individual a prosthetic chamber containing an effective amount of cells secreting the gene product. The prosthetic chamber can be implanted within or proximal to a connective tissue layer including, for example, between the tunica serosa and the tunica muscularis of the digestive tract wall. The gene product to be delivered can be selected from cytokines, hormones, growth factors and blood clotting factors including, for example, Epo or insulin. Expression of the gene product can be constitutive or inducible. Therefor, the invention provides a method of treating a pathology mediated by the deficiency of a gene product. The method consists of implanting a prosthetic chamber containing an effective amount of cells expressing therapeutic levels of the deficient gene product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; A61L 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/1816 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962562A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962562 A1 19991209; AU 4410799 A 19991220; CA 2330172 A1 19991209; DE 1083935 T1 20011220; EP 1083935 A1 20010321; ES 2157874 T1 20010901; GR 20010300045 T1 20010831

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040906

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-12-20 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-09-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-09-03 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-09-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157874 T1

2001-08-17 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE