Global Patent Index - EP 1083974 A1

EP 1083974 A1 2001-03-21 - STAND FOR BAR-SHAPED OR PLATE-SHAPED OBJECTS

Title (en)

STAND FOR BAR-SHAPED OR PLATE-SHAPED OBJECTS

Title (de)

STÄNDER FÜR STAB- ODER PLATTENFÖRMIGE GEGENSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

SUPPORT POUR OBJETS EN FORME DE BARRES OU DE PLAQUES

Publication

EP 1083974 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927913 A

Priority

  • DE 19825815 A
  • EP 9903942 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964123A1] The invention relates to a stand (1) for inserting or placing bar-shaped or plate-shaped objects (2), e.g. skis, snowboards or the like, in which these objects (2) are inserted through a receiving opening (3) of the stand (1). The receiving opening (3) can be at least partially closed by means of strip-like, elastically bendable retaining elements (4, 5). When inserting or placing corresponding objects (2), the retaining elements (4, 5) provided on the receiving opening (3) are elastically bent outward in the area of said objects (2). The retaining elements (4, 5) which remain in the resting position thereof and which are adjacent to the retaining elements (4, 5) that are bent outward form the lateral support for the object (2) placed inside the inventive stand.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/02; A47B 81/00; B25H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/00 (2006.01); A63C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/028 (2013.01); A47B 47/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964123A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964123 A1 19991216; AT 235939 T 20030415; AU 4509499 A 19991230; DE 19825815 C1 20000224; EP 1083974 A1 20010321; EP 1083974 B1 20030402; US 6629616 B1 20031007

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060608

2005-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-02-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-07-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904855

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

SI

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-05-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: STAND FOR SKIS, SNOWBOARDS AND THE LIKE

2002-04-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: STAND FOR SKIS, SNOWBOARDS AND THE LIKE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20001116