Global patent index - EP 1083983 A1

EP 1083983 A1 2001-03-21 - DOSING APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUS INJECTION OF A PREFERABLY SMALL AMOUNT OF SECONDARY STERILE LIQUID INTO A FREE-FLOWING PRIMARY COMPONENT OF STERILE LIQUID

Title (en)

DOSING APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUS INJECTION OF A PREFERABLY SMALL AMOUNT OF SECONDARY STERILE LIQUID INTO A FREE-FLOWING PRIMARY COMPONENT OF STERILE LIQUID

Title (de)

DOSIERGERÄT ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN INJIZIEREN EINER VORZUGSWEISE KLEINEN MENGE EINER SEKUNDÄREN STERILEN FLÜSSIGKEIT IN EINEN FREI FLIESSENDEN PRIMÄREN BESTANDTEIL EINER STERILEN FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE DOSAGE DESTINE A L'INJECTION CONTINUE, DE PREFERENCE, D'UNE PETITE QUANTITE D'UN LIQUIDE STERILE SECONDAIRE DANS UNE COMPOSANTE PRIMAIRE FLOTTANT LIBREMENT D'UN LIQUIDE STERILE

Publication

EP 1083983 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927045 A

Priority

  • SE 9900787 W
  • SE 9801615 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958234A1] A dosing apparatus for continuous injection of a small amount of secondary sterile liquid into a free-flowing primary sterile liquid. The dosing apparatus has a controllable valve with a movable closing sleeve (16) for controlling the supply of secondary sterile liquid to the flowing sterile primary liquid and an outer valve member (18), which in itself comprises an inner part (17) which is displaceable in relation to the valve member (18) and which has a recess or duct (19), whose end facing the closing sleeve (16) is covered with a sealing protective wafer (8). A supply tube (12) for supplying secondary sterile liquid is arranged in said recess or duct (19). Finally, the dosing apparatus has a means (24) for rupturing the protective wafer to allow said injection of the secondary sterile liquid into the primary sterile liquid through the supply tube (12). The invention also concerns a method of using said dosing apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/04; B01F 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 5/04 (2006.01); B01F 13/00 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/0205 (2013.01); B01F 3/0865 (2013.01); B01F 5/0471 (2013.01); B01F 13/002 (2013.01); B01F 15/00025 (2013.01); B01F 15/0212 (2013.01); B01F 15/0261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958234A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958234 A1 19991118; AT 230297 T 20030115; AU 4403899 A 19991129; DE 69904719 D1 20030206; DE 69904719 T2 20030918; DK 1083983 T3 20030422; EP 1083983 A1 20010321; EP 1083983 B1 20030102; ES 2188180 T3 20030616; SE 512503 C2 20000327; SE 9801615 D0 19980511; SE 9801615 L 19991112

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-03-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-09-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2188180

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-05-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030510

2003-05-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030510

2003-04-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-04-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-03-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69904719

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-01-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: 20030102

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-01-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-01-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 230297

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-07-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DOSING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS INJECTION OF A PREFERABLY SMALL AMOUNT OF SECONDARY STERILE LIQUID INTO A FREE-FLOWING PRIMARY COMPONENT OF STERILE LIQUID

2001-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AROM PAK INTERNATIONAL AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE