Global Patent Index - EP 1083986 A1

EP 1083986 A1 2001-03-21 - DISPERSIONS CONTAINING HOMOPOLYMERS OR COPOLYMERS OF HYDROXY CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AS A RHEOLOGICAL ADDITIVE

Title (en)

DISPERSIONS CONTAINING HOMOPOLYMERS OR COPOLYMERS OF HYDROXY CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AS A RHEOLOGICAL ADDITIVE

Title (de)

DISPERSIONEN ENTHALTEND HOMO- ODER COPOLYMERE VON HYDROXYCARBONSÄUREN ALS RHEOLOGISCHES ADDITIV

Title (fr)

DISPERSIONS CONTENANT DES HOMO- OU DES COPOLYMERES D'ACIDES HYDROXYCARBOXYLIQUES S'UTILISANT COMME ADDITIF RHEOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 1083986 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919198 A

Priority

  • DE 19816308 A
  • EP 9902323 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19816308A1] The invention relates to dispersions containing an oil and an aqueous phase, at least one dispersed solid and optionally other auxiliary agents, characterized in that the dispersion contains homopolymers or copolymers as a rheological additive which are obtained by condensing ricinoleic acid with the same or in the presence of hydroxy carboxylic acids of formula (I) HO-X-CO-OH or the cyclized derivatives thereof, whereby X represents a linear or branched saturated alkyl radical with 1-23 carbon atoms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 17/36; C09K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 17/52 (2006.01); C08G 63/06 (2006.01); C09K 8/24 (2006.01); C09K 8/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 8/32 (2013.01); C08G 63/06 (2013.01); C09K 8/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952623A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19816308 A1 19991014; AU 3705999 A 19991101; AU 754148 B2 20021107; CA 2327422 A1 19991021; EP 1083986 A1 20010321; NO 20005097 A 20001107; NO 20005097 D0 20001010; WO 9952623 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050428

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT