Global Patent Index - EP 1084003 A1

EP 1084003 A1 2001-03-21 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING OBJECTS MANUALLY BY USE OF SOLVENTS

Title (en)

METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING OBJECTS MANUALLY BY USE OF SOLVENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE MANUELLE REINIGUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LÖSUNGSMITTELN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE NETTOYER MANUELLEMENT DES OBJETS A L'AIDE DE SOLVANTS

Publication

EP 1084003 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922168 A

Priority

  • EP 9903035 W
  • GB 9809090 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955473A1] One or more objects (not shown) to be cleaned are placed in a cleaning chamber (1), which has two sealed sleeves (5) onto which gloves (not shown) are fitted, and the chamber (1) is hermetically sealed. The atmosphere within the chamber (1) is made inert, e.g. by removal of air via pipe (7) and supply of nitrogen via one inlet (8). A solvent, at a temperature below its flashpoint is supplied to the chamber (1), e.g. from reservoir (13). The object or objects are then cleaned. The solvent may be sprayed onto them. A brush may be used. Afterwards, solvent is drained from the interior of the chamber (1). Compressed air is supplied to reverse the inert state of the atmosphere therein and dry the cleaned object or objects and the interior of the chamber. Residual solvent vapours may be removed via a refrigeration unit (18) and returned to the reservoir.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/00 (2006.01); B08B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/006 (2013.01); B08B 15/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955473A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955473 A1 19991104; AU 3931299 A 19991116; EP 1084003 A1 20010321; EP 1084003 B1 20041222; GB 0025478 D0 20001129; GB 2351802 A 20010110; GB 2351802 B 20020612; GB 9809090 D0 19980624

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERFREIGHT-SHIPPING-COMPANY-LIMITED

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR