Global Patent Index - EP 1084010 A1

EP 1084010 A1 2001-03-21 - METHOD FOR DRIVING AN ELECTRIC SCREWING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DRIVING AN ELECTRIC SCREWING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ANTREIBEN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN SCHRAUBVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE VISSAGE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1084010 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926490 A

Priority

  • DE 19824495 A
  • EP 9903772 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824495A1] The invention relates to a method for driving an electric screwing device during which a control device supplies electric current in the form of pulse signals to an electric motor. In addition, the motor generates a torque which turns a screwing tool with a rotational speed for driving a screw. In order to relieve a device operator from the burdensome support of the reaction moment as greatly as possible, the invention provides that the interpulse period between two pulse signals is determined in such a way that the rotational speed of the motor during the interpulse period is significantly reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/147; H02P 7/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 21/00 (2006.01); B25B 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 21/00 (2013.01); B25B 21/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962675A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824495 A1 19991209; EP 1084010 A1 20010321; EP 1084010 B1 20021030; ES 2186364 T3 20030501; WO 9962675 A1 19991209; WO 9962675 B1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-01 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2004-04-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20031116

2004-04-07 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20031116

2003-09-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: METABOWERKE GMBH & CO.DIPL.-ING. BODO THIELKIN

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030506

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030505

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186364 T3

2003-04-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030401

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903258 20021205

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE