Global Patent Index - EP 1084052 A1

EP 1084052 A1 2001-03-21 - VEHICLE PART WITH AN AIRBAG DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VEHICLE PART OF THIS TYPE

Title (en)

VEHICLE PART WITH AN AIRBAG DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VEHICLE PART OF THIS TYPE

Title (de)

FAHRZEUGTEIL MIT EINER AIRBAGVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN SOLCHES FAHRZEUGTEIL

Title (fr)

PARTIE DE VEHICULE COMPORTANT UN AIRBAG ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE PARTIE DE VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1084052 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936335 A

Priority

  • DE 9901564 W
  • DE 29809554 U
  • DE 29819165 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961288A1] The invention relates to a vehicle part (8), comprising an airbag device and a support (7). Coverings (3) are connected to the airbag device. Before the airbag is deployed, said coverings are arranged in an opening in the support (7) in a rest position, at least essentially flush. After the airbag device has been deployed, the coverings are moved away from the occupant, into a pullback position at least essentially behind or in the vehicle part, by an appropriate mechanism (4). The support and the coverings have a combined surface layer (9) in the direction of the occupant. Connection devices by which means the surface layer (9) is permanently connected to the coverings and/or the mechanism in the area of the coverings (3), at least adjacent to parts of the periphery of the opening are provided. The invention also relates to a method for producing a vehicle part of this type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 21/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 37/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/2155 (2011.01); B60R 21/2165 (2011.01); B60R 21/215 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/2155 (2013.01); B60R 21/2165 (2013.01); B60R 2021/21652 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961288A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961288 A1 19991202; AT 361223 T 20070515; DE 59914327 D1 20070614; EP 1084052 A1 20010321; EP 1084052 B1 20070502; JP 2002516212 A 20020604; US 6523854 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070502

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070527

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070502

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070502

2008-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080205

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-12-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-11-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070502

2007-08-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914327 P 20070614

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2007-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE