Global Patent Index - EP 1084062 A1

EP 1084062 A1 2001-03-21 - OPENING/CLOSING DEVICE IN PARTICULAR FOR CONTAINER WITH FLEXIBLE WALL AND CONTAINER WITH FLEXIBLE WALL ASSOCIATED WITH SAID DEVICE

Title (en)

OPENING/CLOSING DEVICE IN PARTICULAR FOR CONTAINER WITH FLEXIBLE WALL AND CONTAINER WITH FLEXIBLE WALL ASSOCIATED WITH SAID DEVICE

Title (de)

ÖFFNUNGS-UND VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLEXIBLE BEHÄLTER UND BEHÄLTER VERSEHEN MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE/FERMETURE NOTAMMENT POUR CONTENANT A PAROI SOUPLE ET CONTENANT A PAROI SOUPLE ET EMBOUT TUBULAIRE ASSOCIES A UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1084062 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99922030 A

Priority

  • CH 9900242 W
  • CH 9800243 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962785A1] The invention concerns a device wherein the lid (2), when it is in closed position, closes the tubular guide (1) top opening. The nozzle (3) fixed by its base to a container or bag containing the liquid, is engaged in the guide (1) and fixed thereto by its base by bayonet fitting (21, 22) enclosing between the two parts the support neck (5). By pivoting about criss-cross ribs (10) the lid (2) tilts over such that its cam surface (13), then its locking surface (20) press laterally on the nozzle (3) and maintain the lips (19) in open position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/20; B65D 75/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/20 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5883 (2013.01); B65D 47/2037 (2013.01); B65D 2575/583 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962785A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962785 A1 19991209; AT 223851 T 20020915; AU 7423798 A 19991220; DE 69902905 D1 20021017; EP 1084062 A1 20010321; EP 1084062 B1 20020911; WO 9962784 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *REITZEL (SUISSE)

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020911

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-12 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902905 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223851 T 20020915

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT