Global Patent Index - EP 1084098 A4

EP 1084098 A4 2004-12-22 - INHIBITORS OF THE ANANDAMIDE TRANSPORTER AS ANALGESIC AGENTS

Title (en)

INHIBITORS OF THE ANANDAMIDE TRANSPORTER AS ANALGESIC AGENTS

Title (de)

INHIBITOREN DES ANANDAMID-TRANSPORTERS ALS ANALGETISCHE MITTEL

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE VEHICULE D'ANANDAMIDE COMME AGENTS ANALGESIQUES

Publication

EP 1084098 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99930176 A

Priority

  • US 9912900 W
  • US 8856898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964389A1] This invention relates to anandamide transport inhibitors and their use as analgesic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 53/00; A01N 37/02; A01N 37/06; A61K 31/22; A61K 31/23; C07C 63/00; C07C 229/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 319/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/16 (2006.01); A61K 31/166 (2006.01); A61K 31/22 (2006.01); A61K 31/23 (2006.01); A61K 31/357 (2006.01); A61K 31/557 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); C07B 59/00 (2006.01); C07C 233/05 (2006.01); C07C 233/27 (2006.01); C07C 235/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 235/46 (2013.01); A61K 31/16 (2013.01); A61K 31/166 (2013.01); A61K 31/557 (2013.01); C07B 59/001 (2013.01); C07C 233/05 (2013.01); C07C 233/27 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9745407 A1 19971204 - UNIV CONNECTICUT [US]
  • [Y] US 5618955 A 19970408 - MECHOULAM RAPHAEL [IL], et al
  • [PY] MECHOULAM R ET AL: "TOWARDS CANNABINOID DRUGS - REVISITED", PROGRESS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 35, 3 July 1998 (1998-07-03), pages 199 - 243, XP009024019, ISSN: 0079-6468
  • See also references of WO 9964389A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964389 A1 19991216; CA 2337822 A1 19991216; EP 1084098 A1 20010321; EP 1084098 A4 20041222; JP 2002517479 A 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071128

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-12-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041109

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAKRIYANNIS, ALEXANDROS

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOUTOPOULOS, ANDREAS

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOUTOPOULOS, ANDREAS

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THE UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOUTOPOULOS, ANDREAS

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE