Global Patent Index - EP 1084210 A1

EP 1084210 A1 2001-03-21 - INTUMESCENT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

INTUMESCENT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

INTUMESZIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION INTUMESCENTE

Publication

EP 1084210 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922308 A

Priority

  • GB 9901529 W
  • GB 9810529 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960074A1] The composition contains exfoliating graphite and a carrier which is preferably polyvinyl chloride, polyethylene or polypropylene. The composition can be produced by co-extrusion of a suitable mixture with a further plastics material to form composite products in continuous lengths. The products include papers, tubes, fuel, pipes, doorstrips, electrical conduit and electrical cables.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 21/14; H01B 7/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 21/14 (2006.01); H01B 7/295 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/295 (2013.01); C09K 21/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960074A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960074 A1 19991125; AU 3941499 A 19991206; CA 2332147 A1 19991125; CA 2332147 C 20100504; CN 1305518 A 20010725; EP 1084210 A1 20010321; GB 9810529 D0 19980715

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20071228

2007-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROYAL GROUP, INC.

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROYAL GROUP TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030919

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE