Global Patent Index - EP 1084217 B1

EP 1084217 B1 2002-09-04 - DETERGENTS CONTAINING AMYLASE AND ACETONITRILE

Title (en)

DETERGENTS CONTAINING AMYLASE AND ACETONITRILE

Title (de)

AMYLASE UND ACETONITRIL-DERIVATE ENTHALTENDE WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENTS CONTENANT UNE AMYLASE ET DES DERIVES D'ACETONITRILE

Publication

EP 1084217 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99925032 A

Priority

  • DE 19824687 A
  • EP 9903570 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824687A1] The invention aims at improving the cleaning performance of detergents containing enzymes, especially in relation to starch-containing stains. This is substantially achieved in that the detergent contains alpha -amylase from Bacillus amyloliquefaciens and a compound having formula (I) R<1>R<2>R<3>N<+>CH2CN X<->, wherein R<1>, R<2> and R<3> independently stand for an alkyl, alkenyl or aryl group with 1 to 18 C atoms, whereby the groups R<2> and R<3> can also be part of a heterocycle comprising an N atom and optionally other heteroatoms and X is a charge-equalizing anion, <->in addition to other usual ingredients compatible with said constituents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386; C11D 1/62; C11D 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 3/26 (2006.01); C11D 3/28 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 7/42 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/26 (2013.01); C11D 3/28 (2013.01); C11D 3/386 (2013.01); C11D 3/3902 (2013.01); C11D 3/3932 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824687 A1 19991209; AT 223473 T 20020915; EP 1084217 A1 20010321; EP 1084217 B1 20020904; ES 2183561 T3 20030316; HU 0102184 A2 20011028; JP 2002517553 A 20020618; PL 344533 A1 20011105; WO 9963038 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070526

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070526

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070525

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-07-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060503

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183561 T3

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902575 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223473 T 20020915

2002-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL