Global Patent Index - EP 1084219 A1

EP 1084219 A1 2001-03-21 - DETERGENT CONTAINING AMYLASE AND PERCARBONATE

Title (en)

DETERGENT CONTAINING AMYLASE AND PERCARBONATE

Title (de)

AMYLASE UND PERCARBONAT ENTHALTENDE WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENTS CONTENANT UNE AMYLASE ET UN PERCARBONATE

Publication

EP 1084219 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926384 A

Priority

  • DE 19824688 A
  • EP 9903563 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824688A1] Detergent characterized in that it contains alpha -amylase from Bacillus amyloliquefaciens and an alkaline percarbonate, in addition to other usual ingredients compatible with said constituents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/04 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38609 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963036A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824688 A1 19991209; AT 340241 T 20061015; DE 59913862 D1 20061102; EP 1084219 A1 20010321; EP 1084219 B1 20060920; ES 2272070 T3 20070416; HU 0102183 A2 20011028; JP 2002517551 A 20020618; PL 344482 A1 20011105; WO 9963036 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-03 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090925

2010-03-03 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090925

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090605

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-08-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20070620

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2272070 T3

2007-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-01-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913862 P 20061102

2006-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2006-09-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060920

2006-09-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060920

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL