Global Patent Index - EP 1084224 A1

EP 1084224 A1 2001-03-21 - AQUEOUS BLEACHING AGENT WITH VISCOSE STRUCTURE

Title (en)

AQUEOUS BLEACHING AGENT WITH VISCOSE STRUCTURE

Title (de)

STRUKTURVISKOSES WÄSSRIGES BLEICHMITTEL

Title (fr)

AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT AQUEUX A STRUCTURE VISQUEUSE

Publication

EP 1084224 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926391 A

Priority

  • DE 19824708 A
  • EP 9903573 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824708A1] The invention aims at solving the problem of hydrogen peroxide wastage when the agent is poured on dirty textiles and the increased oxidative load on the textile when pretreatment agents containing peroxide are used in an aqueous bleaching agent serving as laundry pretreatment agent. This is substantially achieved by an agent containing 0.2 to 25 % by weight of hydrogen peroxide, complexing agents for heavy metals in a quantity of up to 5 % by weight, surfactants in a quantity of up to 15 % by weight, free-radical scavengers in a quantity of up to 0.1 % by weight and water in quantities ranging from 55 to 90 % by weight and a polysaccharide thickening active substance in quantities such that the substance has a viscosity in the range of from 200 mPa.s to 5,000 mPa.s at 20 DEG C and at rpm 20 (Brookfield rotational viscometer) and a viscosity at rpm 5 (Brookfield rotational viscometer) that is at least 1.5 higher than at rpm 50.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 1/29; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 3/36 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0084 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 3/33 (2013.01); C11D 3/361 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 17/003 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963042A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824708 A1 19991209; AT 231543 T 20030215; EP 1084224 A1 20010321; EP 1084224 B1 20030122; ES 2191434 T3 20030901; WO 9963042 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-05-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-05-02 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070124

2006-07-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060503

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2003-12-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191434 T3

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904101 P 20030227

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL