Global patent index - EP 1084276 A1

EP 1084276 A1 2001-03-21 - SUPPORT FOR THE PARALLEL IDENTIFICATION AND ESTABLISHMENT OF TRANSCRIPTION PROFILES OF POLYNUCLEIC ACIDS

Title (en)

SUPPORT FOR THE PARALLEL IDENTIFICATION AND ESTABLISHMENT OF TRANSCRIPTION PROFILES OF POLYNUCLEIC ACIDS

Title (de)

TRÄGER FÜR DIE PARALLELE IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND ERSTELLUNG VON TRANSKRIPTIONSPROFILEN VON POLYNUCLEINSÄUREN

Title (fr)

SUPPORT POUR L'IDENTIFICATION ET L'ETABLISSEMENT EN PARALLELE DE PROFILS DE TRANSCRIPTION D'ACIDES POLYNUCLEIQUES

Publication

EP 1084276 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931052 A

Priority

  • EP 99931052 A
  • DE 19825899 A
  • EP 9904014 W
  • EP 98110608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964623A1] The invention relates to a support. Oligonucleotides or polynucleotides are covalently bound with the 5'- or 3'-termination on least one main surface of said support via bifunctional spacers and bifunctional linkers. The support is characterized in that the oligonucleotides or polynucleotides which are covalently bound with the 5'- or 3'-termination via bifunctional spacers and bifunctional linkers comprise 200 to 600 bp, and the oligonucleotides or polynucleotides can be obtained by using a method which comprises the following steps: Selecting homologous regions of mRNA of a target species and of at least one model species; selecting amplification primers which permit the amplification of 200 to 600, preferably 200 to 400 bp long nucleic acids from the homologous regions of both the mRNA of the target species and the mRNA of at least one model species, whereby the amplification primers optionally comprise a maximum of 1 mismatch per 6 nucleic acids of the amplification primer; immobilizing the nucleic acids on at the least one main surface of the support, said nucleic acids being obtained from the corresponding 200 to 600 bp long nucleic acids which are amplified for the target species or for the at least one model species by amplifications using the amplification primers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C40B 40/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6834 (2013.01); C07H 21/00 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00529 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00608 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00612 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00626 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00637 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00722 (2013.01); C07B 2200/11 (2013.01); C40B 40/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964623A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964623 A1 19991216; AU 4771199 A 19991230; CA 2330478 A1 19991216; EP 1084276 A1 20010321; JP 2002517257 A 20020618; US 6830886 B1 20041214

INPADOC legal status

2009-07-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090207

2008-10-29 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17C

- Effective date: 20080926

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080721

2005-08-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEMOREC BIOTEC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEMOREC STOFFEL GMBH-MEDIZINISCH-MOLEKULARE ENTWIC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE