Global Patent Index - EP 1084281 A1

EP 1084281 A1 2001-03-21 - TIN ALLOY WHEEL BALANCING WEIGHTS

Title (en)

TIN ALLOY WHEEL BALANCING WEIGHTS

Title (de)

AUSWÜCHTKÖRPER BESTEHEND AUS EINER SN-LEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

MASSES D'EQUILIBRAGE DE ROUES EN ALLIAGE D'ETAIN

Publication

EP 1084281 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919370 A

Priority

  • GB 9901282 W
  • GB 9808981 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955924A1] A wheel weight suitable for balancing the wheels of automobiles which comprises an alloy of tin having a melting range with an upper limit of below approximately 320 DEG C and a hardness of at least approximately 6Hv.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 13/00; F16F 15/32; F16F 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 13/00 (2006.01); C22C 13/02 (2006.01); F16F 15/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16F 15/324 (2013.01); C22C 13/00 (2013.01); F16F 15/328 (2013.01); F16F 2224/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955924A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955924 A1 19991104; AU 3717399 A 19991116; CA 2330035 A1 19991104; DE 1084281 T1 20010823; EP 1084281 A1 20010321; ES 2159275 T1 20011001; GB 9808981 D0 19980624; JP 2002513084 A 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030827

2001-10-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159275 T1

2001-08-23 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-08-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-06-08 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE