Global Patent Index - EP 1084290 A1

EP 1084290 A1 2001-03-21 - PULPER

Title (en)

PULPER

Title (de)

STOFFLÖSEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

BROYEUR

Publication

EP 1084290 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927861 A

Priority

  • DE 19824806 A
  • EP 9903852 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824806A1] The invention relates to a pulper device comprising a vessel (1) in which an annular flow can be generated. Said flow acts upon a liquid-solid mixture located inside said vessel (1) and effects a pulping of the same. Said device also comprises a screening device (4) for separating course materials from the suspension, whereby the screening device (4) has the shape of a truncated cone. Said truncated cone is provided with holes on the lateral surface thereof and can be mounted on the base of the vessel (1) in such a way that the truncated cone points upward with the small circular surface thereof, and the lateral surface lies in an approximately tangential manner to the toroidal flow. The screening device (4) is subdivided into different segments and these segments can be individually mounted from the external side of the vessel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21B 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/345 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963148A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824806 A1 19991209; AT 222970 T 20020915; BR 9910855 A 20010306; BR 9910855 B1 20100921; CA 2333640 A1 19991209; CA 2333640 C 20061114; CZ 20004467 A3 20010411; CZ 291696 B6 20030514; EP 1084290 A1 20010321; EP 1084290 B1 20020828; ES 2183571 T3 20030316; JP 2002517620 A 20020618; JP 3608652 B2 20050112; PL 189958 B1 20051031; PL 344680 A1 20011119; US 6379505 B1 20020430; WO 9963148 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BTA INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-02-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090129 AND 20090204

2008-04-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BTA INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2183571

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-02

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 222970

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE