Global Patent Index - EP 1084295 A2

EP 1084295 A2 2001-03-21 - A PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PAPER

Title (en)

A PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPIER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1084295 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99947042 A

Priority

  • EP 99947042 A
  • EP 98850067 A
  • SE 9900678 W
  • US 8325398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0953680A1] The invention relates to a process for the production of paper from a suspension containing cellulosic fibres, and optional fillers, which comprises adding to the suspension a drainage and/or retention aid comprising a cationic organic polymer, forming and dewatering the suspension on a wire, wherein the cationic organic polymer has an aromatic group and the suspension which is dewatered on the wire has a conductivity of at least 2.0 mS/cm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 220/34 (2006.01); C08F 220/56 (2006.01); D21F 1/66 (2006.01); D21H 11/00 (2006.01); D21H 17/24 (2006.01); D21H 17/28 (2006.01); D21H 17/29 (2006.01); D21H 17/32 (2006.01); D21H 17/44 (2006.01); D21H 17/45 (2006.01); D21H 17/67 (2006.01); D21H 17/68 (2006.01); D21H 21/10 (2006.01); D21H 23/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/04 (2006.01); D21H 23/08 (2006.01); D21H 23/14 (2006.01); C08F 20/56 (2006.01); D21H 11/14 (2006.01); D21H 17/01 (2006.01); D21H 17/37 (2006.01); D21H 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/08 (2013.01); D21H 21/10 (2013.01); D21H 11/14 (2013.01); D21H 17/01 (2013.01); D21H 17/24 (2013.01); D21H 17/28 (2013.01); D21H 17/32 (2013.01); D21H 17/375 (2013.01); D21H 17/455 (2013.01); D21H 17/68 (2013.01); D21H 23/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955962A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953680 A1 19991103; AT 243281 T 20030715; AT 243282 T 20030715; AT 257530 T 20040115; AU 4301499 A 19991116; AU 4401599 A 19991116; AU 4401699 A 19991116; AU 747089 B2 20020509; AU 748735 B2 20020613; AU 750335 B2 20020718; BR 9909945 A 20001226; BR 9909945 B1 20090811; BR 9909946 A 20010306; BR 9909946 B1 20091201; BR 9909947 A 20001226; CA 2329027 A1 19991104; CA 2329027 C 20050215; CA 2329028 A1 19991104; CA 2329028 C 20051122; CA 2329191 A1 19991104; CA 2329191 C 20060627; CN 1139691 C 20040225; CN 1155754 C 20040630; CN 1205386 C 20050608; CN 1298466 A 20010606; CN 1299425 A 20010613; CN 1300332 A 20010620; CZ 20003937 A3 20011212; CZ 20003938 A3 20010711; CZ 20003939 A3 20011212; CZ 301092 B6 20091104; CZ 301693 B6 20100526; DE 69908938 T2 20031218; DE 69908939 T2 20040513; DE 69914078 T2 20041014; DK 1080271 T3 20030922; DK 1080272 T3 20031006; DK 1084295 T3 20040426; EP 1080271 A1 20010307; EP 1080271 B1 20030618; EP 1080272 A1 20010307; EP 1080272 B1 20030618; EP 1084295 A2 20010321; EP 1084295 B1 20040107; ES 2196815 T3 20031216; ES 2201725 T3 20040316; ES 2211166 T3 20040701; ID 27307 A 20010322; ID 27490 A 20010412; ID 27899 A 20010503; JP 2002513102 A 20020508; JP 2002513103 A 20020508; JP 2002513104 A 20020508; JP 3890194 B2 20070307; JP 4307721 B2 20090805; NZ 507604 A 20030926; NZ 507605 A 20030131; NZ 507606 A 20030725; PL 200673 B1 20090130; PL 200811 B1 20090227; PL 201054 B1 20090331; PL 344040 A1 20010924; PL 344053 A1 20010924; PL 344079 A1 20010924; PT 1080271 E 20031031; PT 1080272 E 20031031; PT 1084295 E 20040430; RU 2000129670 A 20040327; RU 2185470 C1 20020720; RU 2194106 C2 20021210; RU 2194818 C2 20021220; WO 9955962 A2 19991104; WO 9955962 A3 19991216; WO 9955964 A1 19991104; WO 9955965 A1 19991104; ZA 200005550 B 20010511; ZA 200005551 B 20010511; ZA 200005552 B 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140427

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140426

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140426

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140427

2015-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140426

2015-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140426

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69914078

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140426

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 257530 T

- Effective date: 20140426

2014-12-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-03 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69914078

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130506

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130409

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-11-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Free text: AKZO NOBEL N.V.#VELPERWEG 76, POSTBUS 9300#6824 BM ARNHEM (NL) -TRANSFER TO- AKZO NOBEL N.V.#VELPERWEG 76, POSTBUS 9300#6824 BM ARNHEM (NL)

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211166 T3

2004-05-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-04-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

2004-03-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EKA CHEMICALS AB

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914078 P 20040212

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE