Global patent index - EP 1084308 A1

EP 1084308 A1 2001-03-21 - METHOD FOR REGULATING ESPECIALLY THE PIVOTING DEVICE OF A MOBILE MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REGULATING ESPECIALLY THE PIVOTING DEVICE OF A MOBILE MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG INSBESONDERE DER SCHWENKEINRICHTUNG EINER MOBILEN ARBEITSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REGULER NOTAMMENT LE DISPOSITIF DE PIVOTEMENT D'UN ENGIN MOBILE

Publication

EP 1084308 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99925003 A

Priority

  • DE 19824319 A
  • EP 9903410 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824319A1] The invention relates to a method for regulating especially the pivoting device of a mobile machine, especially a construction machine such as a hydraulic excavator or similar. A hydraulic pump (3) functioning in a closed circuit (5), especially a pivot circuit (5), is driven by at least one driving motor (1), especially a diesel motor (1). Said hydraulic pump (3) feeds at least one hydraulic motor (4) whose energy is transmitted to a mass (7) to be sped up or slowed down, especially a live ring of a revolving superstructure interacting with the working devices, by means of a downstream, especially mechanical gear (6). A set value-actual value comparison of the nominal and limit number of revolutions of the driving motor (1) is carried out especially when the mass (7) is being slowed down and in the event that a predetermined number of revolutions is exceeded, especially the limit number of revolutions of the driving motor (1), the braking pressure in the closed circuit (5), especially the pivot circuit (5), is reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/12; B66C 23/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/86 (2006.01); E02F 9/12 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); E02F 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/86 (2013.01); E02F 9/121 (2013.01); E02F 9/123 (2013.01); E02F 9/128 (2013.01); E02F 9/2232 (2013.01); E02F 9/2292 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963168A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824319 A1 19991216; EP 1084308 A1 20010321; EP 1084308 B1 20021120; JP 2002517640 A 20020618; WO 9963168 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140518

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140518

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903472

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-02

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEREX GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: O & K MINING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT