Global Patent Index - EP 1084308 B1

EP 1084308 B1 2002-11-20 - METHOD FOR REGULATING ESPECIALLY THE PIVOTING DEVICE OF A MOBILE MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REGULATING ESPECIALLY THE PIVOTING DEVICE OF A MOBILE MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG INSBESONDERE DER SCHWENKEINRICHTUNG EINER MOBILEN ARBEITSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REGULER NOTAMMENT LE DISPOSITIF DE PIVOTEMENT D'UN ENGIN MOBILE

Publication

EP 1084308 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99925003 A

Priority

  • DE 19824319 A
  • EP 9903410 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824319A1] The invention relates to a method for regulating especially the pivoting device of a mobile machine, especially a construction machine such as a hydraulic excavator or similar. A hydraulic pump (3) functioning in a closed circuit (5), especially a pivot circuit (5), is driven by at least one driving motor (1), especially a diesel motor (1). Said hydraulic pump (3) feeds at least one hydraulic motor (4) whose energy is transmitted to a mass (7) to be sped up or slowed down, especially a live ring of a revolving superstructure interacting with the working devices, by means of a downstream, especially mechanical gear (6). A set value-actual value comparison of the nominal and limit number of revolutions of the driving motor (1) is carried out especially when the mass (7) is being slowed down and in the event that a predetermined number of revolutions is exceeded, especially the limit number of revolutions of the driving motor (1), the braking pressure in the closed circuit (5), especially the pivot circuit (5), is reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/12; B66C 23/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/86 (2006.01); E02F 9/12 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); E02F 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/86 (2013.01); E02F 9/121 (2013.01); E02F 9/123 (2013.01); E02F 9/128 (2013.01); E02F 9/2232 (2013.01); E02F 9/2292 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824319 A1 19991216; EP 1084308 A1 20010321; EP 1084308 B1 20021120; JP 2002517640 A 20020618; WO 9963168 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903472

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140518

2015-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140518

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903472 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEREX GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: O & K MINING GMBH

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT