Global Patent Index - EP 1084322 A1

EP 1084322 A1 2001-03-21 - CLOSING DEVICE FOR CLOSING FUNCTIONS IN VEHICLES IN PARTICULAR

Title (en)

CLOSING DEVICE FOR CLOSING FUNCTIONS IN VEHICLES IN PARTICULAR

Title (de)

SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR INSBESONDERE AN FAHRZEUGEN VOLLZIEHBARE SCHLIESSFUNKTIONEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE POUR FONCTIONS DE FERMETURE POUVANT ETRE EXECUTEES NOTAMMENT SUR DES VEHICULES

Publication

EP 1084322 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99925013 A

Priority

  • DE 19824398 A
  • DE 19853543 A
  • EP 9903447 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6439016B1] A closing device with a closing cylinder for closing functions to be performed especially on vehicles has a radial recess for the locking and control member that is open toward the exterior of the housing and the locking and control member is exposed in the radially outward direction, but is covered by a leaf-shaped spring. A spring is arranged in the circumferential area of the housing and acts directly on the locking and control member. The control and locking member is arranged radially adjacent to the cylinder portion of the cylinder core being provided with followers. A slide is positioned in a portion of the closing cylinder axially stepped relative to the locking and control member, and an axial connection bridges the spacing between the locking and control member and the slide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/00; E05B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/04 (2006.01); E05B 77/00 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/04 (2013.01); E05B 17/0058 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7706 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7751 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7949 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963187A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6439016 B1 20020827; AU 4144899 A 19991220; AU 747009 B2 20020509; BR 9910839 A 20010306; CN 1211555 C 20050720; CN 1303458 A 20010711; CZ 20004423 A3 20010815; CZ 298358 B6 20070905; EP 1084322 A1 20010321; EP 1084322 B1 20020327; ES 2171329 T3 20020901; JP 2002517641 A 20020618; JP 4221691 B2 20090212; PT 1084322 E 20020830; SK 17072000 A3 20021008; SK 286193 B6 20080506; WO 9963187 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160520

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160521

2017-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160520

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161121

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160520

2017-01-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171329 T3

2002-08-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-06-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901071 20020502

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE