Global Patent Index - EP 1084342 A1

EP 1084342 A1 2001-03-21 - ASSEMBLY FOR TRANSFERRING FUEL FROM A MOTOR VEHICLE TANK

Title (en)

ASSEMBLY FOR TRANSFERRING FUEL FROM A MOTOR VEHICLE TANK

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFDRUCKBEAUFSCHLAGUNGSEINRICHTUNG IN EINEM FAHRZEUGKRAFTSTOFFBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE PUISAGE DE CARBURANT DANS UN RESERVOIR DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1084342 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99920912 A

Priority

  • FR 9901216 W
  • FR 9806589 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779184A1] The invention concerns an fuel- assembly for transferring fuel from a motor vehicle tank comprising a main pump (110) associated with a pressure regulator (170) and a reserve bowl (150) fed by a jet pump (160) and wherein the main pump (110) sucks up. The invention is characterised in that the jet pump (160) is integrated in the pressure regulator outlet (170) and the jet pump (160)/regulator (170) subassembly thus formed is made integral with a module (100) comprising the main pump (110) and the reserve bowl (150).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/10; F02M 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/02 (2006.01); F02M 37/10 (2006.01); F02M 37/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/025 (2013.01); F02M 37/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961777A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779184 A1 19991203; FR 2779184 B1 20010126; BR 9910705 A 20010130; DE 69902533 D1 20020919; DE 69902533 T2 20021219; EP 1084342 A1 20010321; EP 1084342 B1 20020814; JP 2002516950 A 20020611; US 6502558 B1 20030107; WO 9961777 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-05-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050525

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902533

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT