Global Patent Index - EP 1084349 B1

EP 1084349 B1 2002-11-27 - REGULATING DEVICE FOR HYDRAULIC WORKING TOOLS

Title (en)

REGULATING DEVICE FOR HYDRAULIC WORKING TOOLS

Title (de)

REGELVORRICHTUNG FÜR HYDRAULISCHE ARBEITSGERÄTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DESTINE A DES APPAREILS HYDRAULIQUES

Publication

EP 1084349 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924562 A

Priority

  • AT 9900145 W
  • AT 39298 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966212A2] The invention describes a regulating device for at least two working tools (2, 3) operated with a hydraulic fluid, more particularly, hydraulic oil (7), e.g. cutters (4), expanders (7) used in mining, etc. each of which includes a tool (2, 3), a supply circuit (10, 11) for the hydraulic fluid (6) and at least one pressure generating device (9). At least one control device (15) formed by a control valve (23, 24) is mounted in the supply circuits (10, 11) for the working tool (2, 3). If required, fluid connection of the control valves (23, 24) is made possible through at least one connecting channel (25) or a connecting line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/17; E21F 11/00; F15B 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21F 11/00 (2006.01); F15B 11/17 (2006.01); F15B 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21F 11/00 (2013.01); F15B 11/17 (2013.01); F15B 13/06 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20576 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30595 (2013.01); F15B 2211/71 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966212 A2 19991223; WO 9966212 A3 20000406; AT 228616 T 20021215; AT 3018 U1 19990825; AU 4121499 A 20000105; DE 59903552 D1 20030109; EP 1084349 A2 20010321; EP 1084349 B1 20021127; US 6578357 B1 20030617

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170609

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170608

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170602

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903552 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228616 T 20021215

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMOLLNGRUBER, JOHANN

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020507

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL